Joaquim Mourão Garcês Palha, governor of Índia, * | Geneall.net
geneall.net
› name › joaquim-mourao-garces-pal...
Joaquim Mourão Garcês Palha, governador da Índia, * | Geneall.net
geneall.net
† Ilhas de Goa, Ribandar, · Costados · Família ...
The A to Z of the Hong Kong SAR and the Macao SAR
books.google.co.uk
... set up the Absolutist regime Govemment Council; restored the Conservative regime Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha Govemment Council Joao Cabral de Estefique ...
An Historical and Archæological Sketch of the City of Goa: ...
books.google.co.uk
Joaquim Mourão Garces Palha governed from 25th April to 20th May José Ferreira Pestana assumed the reins of government on the last mentioned ...
The A to Z of the Hong Kong SAR and the Macao SAR - Ming K. Chan,...
books.google.co.uk
... regime Govemment Council; restored the Conservative regime Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha Govemment Council Joao Cabral de Estefique Bernardo Jose ...
Cesário Verde - Google Books
books.google.de
Leal, o 2." visconde de Bucelas, Joaquim Mourão Garcês Palha ( ), ...
An historical and archæological sketch of the city of Goa ...
archive.org
Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha governed from 25th. April to 20th May Jose Ferreira Pestana assumed the reins of government. › download
The New Cambridge History Of India, Volume 1, Part 1
vdoc.pub
Francisco Xavier da Silva Pereira, Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha, 1843—4 91 Jose Ferreira Pestana, Jose Joaquim Januario ... › History
澳門總督 - 中文百科全書
www.newton.com.tw
73 包也Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha 1825年7月28日. 74 政務委員會執政Conselho de Governo 1827年11月15日. 75 依德費基Joao Cabral de Estefique 1830年7月7日. › wiki
澳門總督(簡稱澳督) - 中文百科知識
www.easyatm.com.tw
73 包也Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha 1825年7月28日 74 政務委員會執政Conselho de Governo 1827年11月15日 75 依德費基 Joao Cabral de Estefique 1830年7月7日 › wiki
Joaquim Mourão Garcês Palha | Carreira da Índia
carreiradaindia.wordpress.com
Militar ( ?). Oficial da Armada, foi governador da fortaleza de Diu, em 1800, e membro da segunda Junta Provisional em Três anos mais tarde, foi ...
Joaquim Mourão Garçês Palha | nenotavaiconta
nenotavaiconta.wordpress.com
Posts about Joaquim Mourão Garçês Palha written by nenotavaiconta
NOTÍCIA DE 28 DE JULHO DE – GOVERNADOR JOAQUIM MOURÃO GARCÊS...
nenotavaiconta.wordpress.com
Em 28 de Julho de 1825, tomou posse do cargo de Governador e Capitão-Geral, o Capitão de Mar e Guerra Joaquim Mourão Garcês Palha.(1) Joaquim Mourão Garcês ...
All web results to the name "Mourao Garces Palha"
EUTELSAT MADEIRA (INCORPORATED IN PORTUGAL B2BHint
b2bhint.com
JOAQUIM PEDRO MOURAO GARCES PALHA PEREIRA DE L. Director (Active). JEAN-FRANCOIS MARIE BERNARD LEPRINCE-L. Director (Active) ... › company › eutelsat-madeira-incor...
The Greater China Factbook (2007) — Part 1: China today
www.academia.edu
... Pereira (Government Council) 25 August Antonio de Mendonca 28 July Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha Corte-Real 15 November Conselho de Governo ... › The_Greater_China_Factb...
【相关问答】罗保澳门_什么是罗保动议 - 旅游攻略网
www.lvyou5.net
年8月19日72 政务委员会执政Conselho de Governo 1823年9月23日73 包也Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha 1825年7月28日74 政务委员会执政Conselho de Governo › question
澳門年表 - GetIt01
www.getit01.com
7月28日包也(Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha) 出任第73任澳門總督。 里斯本試辦葡萄牙到澳門的航海郵政。 1827年(道光七年), 11月15日英國東印度公司郭雷樞(Thomas ... › ...
澳門總督(簡稱澳督) - 華人百科
www.itsfun.com.tw
73 包也Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha 1825年7月28日. 74 政務委員會執政Conselho de Governo 1827年11月15日. 75 依德費基Joao Cabral de Estefique 1830年7月7日. › 澳門總督
澳门总督- 王朝网络移动版
wap.wangchao.net.cn
73 包也Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha 1825年7月28日. 74 政务委员会执政Conselho de Governo 1827年11月15日. 75 依德费基Joao Cabral de Estefique 1830年7月7日. › baike
澳门第127任总督韦奇立的亲笔签名纪念封 - 美丽的神话
www.wjfno1.com
3 Sept — 73 包也Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha 1825年7月28日. 74 政务委员会执政Conselho de Governo 1827年11月15日. 75 依德费基Joao Cabral de Estefique ... › html › report
葡萄牙派駐澳門的總督 - 曉茵萬事通
siaoyin.com
73 包也Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha 1825年7月28日. 74 政務委員會執政Conselho de Governo 1827年11月15日. 75 依德費基 Joao Cabral de Estefique 1830年 7月7日. › InfoBig5
三分鐘瞭解三百年來歷任澳門總督 - 趣關注
auzhu.com
14 Mar — 73 包也Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha 1825年7月28日. 74 政務委員會執政Conselho de Governo 1827年11月15日. 75 依德費基Joao Cabral de Estefique ... › agriculture
三分钟了解三百年来历任澳门总督 - 搜狐网
www.sohu.com
13 Dec — 73 包也Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha 1825年7月28日. 74 政务委员会执政Conselho de Governo 1827年11月15日. 75 依德费基Joao Cabral de Estefique ... › ...
澳门历任总督?_360问答
m.wenda.so.com
... 波沙Major Paulino da Silva Barbosa 1822年8月19日72 政务委员会执政Conselho de Governo 1823年9月23日73 包也Joaquim Mourao Garces Palha 1825年7 ...
Related search requests for Mourao Garces Palha
Jose Ferreira Joao Cabral |
People Forename "Garces" (13) Name "Palha" (1) |
sorted by relevance / date